+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 507
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 59
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 50
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 63
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 17
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate S.J. 14