+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 232
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 199
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 218
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 174
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 180
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent,
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 120
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 96
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent,
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 12
+ − Votes (4)
February 2, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 180
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 13
January 22, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 96
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2021: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 9