+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 696
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 621
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 599
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 553
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 537
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 526
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 489
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 173
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 184 Amendment 36ota
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 184
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 184 Amendment 36oa
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 168
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 153
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 142
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 82
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 21
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2011: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
January 24, 2011: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor