+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 756
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 598
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 586
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 530
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 491
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 449
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 170
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 189
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 157
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 123
- Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3ca
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 23
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 20, 2013: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
January 17, 2013: Education Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor