+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 300
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 258
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 288
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 251
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 235
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 19. H.J. 245
- Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 245 Amendment 3K
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 229
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 218
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 2
- Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 3A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 109
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 89
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 14
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2021: Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 235
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 8, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 19. H.J. 245
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 2
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
January 21, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 89
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 13
January 20, 2021: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1