+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 505
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 77
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 64
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 77
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 67
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 60
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 57
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 27A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 11