+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2017 S.J. 408
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 09, 2017 S.J. 355
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 353
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 333
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 308
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 289
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 163
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 156
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 130
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 20
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
February 3, 2017: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2017: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor