+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 540
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 620
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 524
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 6. S.J. 489
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 510
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 509 Amendment 26G
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 497
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 433
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 279
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 209
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 208 Amendment 26E
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 188
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 174
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 153
- Senate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 152
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Intent to reconsider S.J. 144
- Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 19, NAYS 14. S.J. 144
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 131
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 115
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 90
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 73
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 67
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 60
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 11