+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 688
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 617
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 695
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 575
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 651
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 625
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Health and Human Services, Passed H.J. 567
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 158
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 138
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 95
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. Amendment 24ra
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 17
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2014: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2014: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
January 23, 2014: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7
January 23, 2014: Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor