+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 615
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 845
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 577
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 543
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 753
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 235
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 167
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 136
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 22ya
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 18
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2016: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 29, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
January 26, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7