+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. H.J. 785
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Judiciary Deferred to another day, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 7.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 219
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 152
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 136
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 18
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2016: Judiciary Tabled, Passed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 29, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass, Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
January 27, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7