+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2018 S.J. 660
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 653
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 605
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 0. H.J. 578
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 544
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 391
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 401
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 383
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 329
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2018: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
February 22, 2018: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed
February 7, 2018: Senate Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor