+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 757
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 838
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 754
- Signed by President S.J. 745
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 699
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 721
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 613
- Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 206fa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 437
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 436
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 402
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 239
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2013: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2013: Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 15, 2013: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2013: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor