+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 738
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 598
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 615
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 9. H.J. 552
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 476
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 370
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 381
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 381 Amendment 205tc
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 364
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 322
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 205ta
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 238
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2013: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13
February 12, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
February 5, 2013: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor