+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 659
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 620
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 662
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 587
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 606
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 27. H.J. 605 Amendment 192mc
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 579
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 30. H.J. 578 Amendment 192mb
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 543
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 487
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 410
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 385
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 365
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 330
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 194
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2012: House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2012: Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
February 14, 2012: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor