+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 18. H.J. 520
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 493
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 483
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 377
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 8. J.J. 1
- Motion to amend, Passed J.J. 1 Amendment 191A
- Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 169
- Prime Sponsor Changed at the Request of the Prime Sponsor, S.J. 169
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2021: House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 18. H.J. 520
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 377
- Yeas: 35
February 24, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 8. J.J. 1
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 8
February 9, 2021: Referred to, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2