+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 736
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 731
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 785
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 726
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 757
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 754 Amendment cc190a
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 710
- Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 708 Amendment Cc190a
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 723
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 665
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 668
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 584
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 190cb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 401
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 375
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 337
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 190rb
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 190ra
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 263
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 2015: House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 12, 2015: Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 9, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2015: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2015: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1