+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 36. H.J. 679
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 649
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620
- House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 26. H.J. 617
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Intent to reconsider H.J. 606
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 41. H.J. 605
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 584
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. H.J. 542
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 494
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 487
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 487 Amendment 188oa
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 470
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 444
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 245
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2011: House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 3
February 28, 2011: Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 22, 2011: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor