+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 659
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 689
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 624
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 605
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 636
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 595
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 486
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 4. S.J. 428
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 188rta
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 380
- State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 188ra
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 193
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2012: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2012: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 13, 2012: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor