+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 S.J. 488
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 470
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 488
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 422
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 335
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 256
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 181A
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 154
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 4, 2020: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
February 19, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 13, 2020: Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor