+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 738
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 712
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 773
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 688
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 644
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 6. H.J. 581
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 174ra
- Scheduled for hearing
- Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 174rc
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 513
- Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 174rta
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 326
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 330
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 330 Amendment 174ja
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 316
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 288
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 177
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2013: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 27, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 6
February 25, 2013: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
February 5, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
January 31, 2013: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1