+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 659
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 640
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 689
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 629
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 621
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 633
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 609
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 543
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 174fc
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 432
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 371
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 311
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 174fb
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 176
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 29, 2012: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2012: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2012: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor