+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 756
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 0. H.J. 753
- First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 753
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 172wa
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 1.
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed S.J. 717 Amendment 172wta
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 2. S.J. 725
- Signed by the President S.J. 729
- Delivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 230
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
March 12, 2019: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 12, 2019: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor