+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 S.J. 558
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 520
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 439
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 409
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 340
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 169A
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 155
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 4, 2020: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
February 25, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 20, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor