+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 688
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 773
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670
- Signed by President S.J. 653
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 642
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 703
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 168sta
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 678
- State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 168sa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 534
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 441
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 401
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 199
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 2014: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 35
March 11, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 13
February 24, 2014: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2014: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9