+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 756
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 712
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 773
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 688
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 0. H.J. 638
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 597
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 585
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 559
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 477
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 406
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 394
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 383
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 364
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 340
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 175
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 11
February 21, 2013: Local Government Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 13, 2013: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 35
February 6, 2013: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor