+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 S.J. 559
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 520
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 432
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 373
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 164A
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 155
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 4, 2020: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
February 27, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 25, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor