+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 619
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 603
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 861
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 591
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 836
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 785
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 634
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 403
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 403 Amendment 158xa
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 354
- Scheduled for hearing
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 215
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
March 7, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 4
February 22, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor