+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 714
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 632
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 644
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 613
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 595
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 581
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 553
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 305
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 287
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 258
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 217
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
February 27, 2015: Education Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2015: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2