+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 580
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 544
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 638
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 524
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 591
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 565
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 375
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 268
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 253
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 186
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Present/NV: 7
February 26, 2014: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13
February 10, 2014: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor