+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 672
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 689
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 624
- Signed by President S.J. 623
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 652
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 627
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 459
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 389
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 357
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 170
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2012: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3
February 13, 2012: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor