+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 451
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 469
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 148A
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 411
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 335
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 256
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 118