+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 294
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 284
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 239
- Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 239 Amendment 146B
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 134
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2021: Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 1
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 10, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 239
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17
February 9, 2021: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1