+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 696
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 666
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 688
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 640
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 611
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 578
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 562
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 2. H.J. 509
- Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 146fa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 358
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 380
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 360
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 332
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 213
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2011: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2011: Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
February 9, 2011: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 7, 2011: Taxation Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1