+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 618
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 845
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 555
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 1. H.J. 781
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 750
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 446
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 323
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 303
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 194
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
March 2, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
February 17, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor