+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 S.J. 792
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2018 S.J. 736
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 712
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 704
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 663
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 618
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 140ja
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 570
- Placed on consent, Passed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 371
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 391
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 366
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 313
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 140ka
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 227
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2018: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
February 27, 2018: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 23, 2018: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 6, 2018: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor