+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 402
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 384
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 423
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 345
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 359
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 333
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 275
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 232
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 206
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 155
+ − Votes (3)
February 8, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 7, 2012: Transportation Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2012: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor