+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 619
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 861
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 603
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 591
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 17. H.J. 816
- Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 13. H.J. 815
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 806
- Scheduled for hearing
- State Affairs Removed from table, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 7.
- State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 785
- Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed H.J. 788
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 469
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 11. S.J. 343
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 140ya
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 193
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2016: Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
March 8, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
March 7, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass, Failed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 7
March 7, 2016: State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 7, 2016: State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
February 18, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor