+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 232
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 199
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 218
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 174
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 183
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 130
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 104
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 96
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 15
+ − Votes (4)
February 2, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 183
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2021: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 104
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2021: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
- Yeas: 7