+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 494
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 468
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 445
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 483
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, H.J. 1
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Local Government H.J. 238
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 226
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 186
- Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 186 Amendment 138A
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 134
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 483
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2021: Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Yeas: 13
February 4, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 186
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 3, 2021: Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1