+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 738
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 598
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 615
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 558
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 512
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 340
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 346
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 304
- Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 133fa
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 168
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2013: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2013: Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor