+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 618
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 845
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 577
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 794
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 766
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 743
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 711
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 468
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 341
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 301
- Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 129sa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 129ra
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 177
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
February 29, 2016: Education Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Education Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor