+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 618
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 845
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 555
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 1. H.J. 779
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 749
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 700
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 438
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 436 Amendment 127jc
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 421
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 372
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 127fa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 176
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
March 2, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13
February 24, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
February 19, 2016: Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor