+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 647
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 6. H.J. 664
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 605
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 591
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 562
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 393
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 356 Amendment 126dta
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 353
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 353 Amendment 126kb
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 312
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 126ca
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 126ka
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 187
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 27, 2019: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
February 12, 2019: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 8, 2019: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor