+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 756
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
- Signed by the President S.J. 716
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 4. H.J. 725
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 693
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 714 Amendment Cc123a
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 684 Amendment Cc123a
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 696
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 659
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 9. H.J. 605
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 605 Amendment 123xa
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 588
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 565
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 485
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 459
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 459 Amendment 123jb
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 398
- Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 123ja
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 187