+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 19, NAYS 50. H.J. 608
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 584
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 544
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 448
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 452
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 428
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 196
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 50
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2011: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2011: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4