+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2017 S.J. 747
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2017 S.J. 677
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 655
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 11. H.J. 654
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 612
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 586
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 499
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 503
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 410
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 117wa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 217
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
March 1, 2017: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2017: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2017: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor