+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 538
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 500
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 744
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 481
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 1. H.J. 705
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 687
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 650
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 470
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House & committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 446
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 325
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. S.J. 301
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 164
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
February 17, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 35
February 16, 2016: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor