+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 494
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 468
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 445
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 14. H.J. 487
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 456
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 213
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 195
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 159
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 115
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 14. H.J. 487
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 1
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 159
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor