+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 494
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 468
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 445
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 483
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 455
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed H.J. 1
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 304
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 265
- Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 263 Amendment 111C
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 251
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 115
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 483
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Yeas: 13
February 16, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 265
- Yeas: 35
February 10, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor